U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Max
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 31, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Request]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.