U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Erickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 02, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 03, 2020: [Joinder]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [For Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • July 08, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 01, 2020: [For Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 19, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 06, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.