U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-01001
  • Case Name: Allred v. Vosberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.