U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 25, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 15, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Response]
  • February 13, 2019: [Request]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.