U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Certificate]
  • July 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Request]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.