U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Randle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Furlough]
  • October 07, 2024: [Report/Evaluation Received]
  • October 07, 2024: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Competency Report]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 26, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 04, 2019: [Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 21, 2019: [Response]
  • February 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Request]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 12, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.