U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Staples
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 22, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 04, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Request]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 27, 2019: [Request]
  • February 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.