U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ball
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 20, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Receipt]
  • May 17, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Response]
  • February 15, 2019: [Request]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 13, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.