U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stenstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 27, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 07, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2019: [Response]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Suppress]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Request]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Request]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.