U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 23, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 17, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2019: [Request]
  • February 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.