U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-04031
  • Case Name: Cup O' Dirt LLC v. Badlands Airtime, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 04, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 04, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2020: [Leave to]
  • May 20, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 20, 2020: [Brief]
  • May 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Brief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Discovery Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Answer to Crossclaim]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 18, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 12, 2019: [Joinder]
  • June 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 05, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 14, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • May 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 03, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Request]
  • April 18, 2019: [Joinder]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • April 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 16, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 16, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Return of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2019: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.