U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [For Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.