U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arapahoe, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.