U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2019: [Request]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 21, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.