U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaime-Lara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 13, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Request]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arrest]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.