U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 23, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Psychiatric Report Received]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 16, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • November 25, 2019: [Competency Evaluation]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Request]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [Arrest]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.