U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arapahoe, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.