U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arapahoe, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 01, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.