U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Request]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.