U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Request]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 21, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.