U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seegrist
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Response]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • September 02, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 19, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Suppress]
  • April 17, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Request]
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Request]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.