U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 24, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 18, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 17, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 20, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 17, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 14, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 10, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Request]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 25, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.