U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santustevan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2019: [Response]
  • March 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2019: [Suppress]
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2019: [Request]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.