U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-04044
  • Case Name: Herrera-Rodriguez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Response]
  • May 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Affidavit]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Certificate]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Letter Sent]
  • February 25, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.