U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-30076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 21, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • March 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 26, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Request for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.