U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sitting Up
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.