U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belhage
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 18, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 05, 2019: [Request]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 27, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.