U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Response]
  • June 07, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 02, 2021: [Reconsideration]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Response]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 13, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 02, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 02, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
  • February 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.