U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 13, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 09, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 08, 2019: [Request]
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.