U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pilcher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2019: [Request]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.