U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2019: [Request]
  • March 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.