U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dvorak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 18, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • July 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 26, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2019: [Request]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.