U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 23, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Consent]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Request]
  • March 18, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.