U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vonwille
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 23, 2022: [Set Aside Sentence]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 21, 2021: [Response]
  • April 20, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • March 23, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • March 23, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 22, 2021: [Admission]
  • March 17, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 19, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 07, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • September 08, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 01, 2020: [Text Order]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 30, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 30, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 30, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Verdict]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 29, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 29, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 29, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 27, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 27, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 23, 2020: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Return of Property]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 17, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Response]
  • July 15, 2020: [Text Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 18, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • May 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Certificate]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 31, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 31, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 06, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2020: [Request]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 22, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 22, 2020: [Objection]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2019: [Request]
  • July 15, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (deactivated)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • June 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • June 07, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Response]
  • May 29, 2019: [Request]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 27, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 02, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Response]
  • March 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2019: [Request]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 06, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.