U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 04, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 04, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 12, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 14, 2019: [Response]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Request]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.