U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dubray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2021: [Consent]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 16, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 10, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.