U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 29, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 29, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 11, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2019: [Consent]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 05, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2019: [Summons Issued]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 14, 2019: [Request]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.