U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keckler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Subpoena(s)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Request]
  • May 06, 2020: [Disclosure ]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 18, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Suppress]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Request]
  • April 02, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 12, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.