U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Consent]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.