U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 02, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Request]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Request]
  • April 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Request]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.