U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tiger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 16, 2020: [For Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 03, 2020: [Extend]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Request]
  • April 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2019: [Request]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.