U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stricker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 28, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 05, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • May 13, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 01, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 31, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 31, 2020: [Verdict]
  • January 31, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 31, 2020: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 31, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 29, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 29, 2020: [Jury List]
  • January 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 23, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 21, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 21, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 10, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.