U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pease et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 09, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 09, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • August 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 23, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order for Warrant]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Request]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.