U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 03, 2019: [Furlough]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 21, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • July 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 15, 2019: [Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Request]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.