U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. His Law
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Joinder]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Request]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Request]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.