U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dolphus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 09, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Request]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.