U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Has Horns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Request]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Request]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.