U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 12, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.