U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 06, 2021: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • August 06, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 15, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Request]
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Request]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 14, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.