U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toledo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Modifying Supervised Release]
  • July 23, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Request]
  • July 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2019: [Request]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.